RI H5633 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Rhode Island Community Preservation Act (would Establish The Rhode Island Community Preservation Act To Promote Capital Investment And Development Within Rhode Island Communities)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Rhode Island Community Preservation Act (would Establish The Rhode Island Community Preservation Act To Promote Capital Investment And Development Within Rhode Island Communities)
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2013) |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2013) |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5633.pdf |