RI H5627 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits smoking on public beaches in the state of Rhode Island.
Title
Public Beach Smoking Pollution Control Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5627.pdf |