RI H5623 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that any applicant or holder of a retail license for the sale of alcoholic beverages be required to file a certificate of insurance evidencing liability insurance coverage in certain minimum amounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - Senate - Retail licenses approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2017-09-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2017-09-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2017-09-14SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-27HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-06-27HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-27HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-24HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/27/2017)
2017-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-16HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/20/2017)
2017-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2017-06-09HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2017)
2017-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017)
2017-03-13HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2017)
2017-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback