RI H5612 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for consumer protection in eye care services by developing standards and enforcement protocols related to the utilization of assessment mechanisms in the provision of eye care services.
Title
The Consumer Protection In Eye Care Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-28 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2021) |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2021) |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |