RI H5610 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an electronic vehicle liability insurance confirmation and compliance.
Title
Electronic Confirmation And Compliance System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |