RI H5600 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an equal opportunity unit within the division of state police to adopt an equal opportunity plan to increase the ranks of minorities and women among members of the state police.
Title
State Police - Equal Employment Opportunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5600.pdf |