RI H5593 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- State Building Code (would Give Local Building Officials And Fire Chiefs The Power To Grant Variances From The State Building Code)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- State Building Code (would Give Local Building Officials And Fire Chiefs The Power To Grant Variances From The State Building Code)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5593.pdf |