RI H5588 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Amending The Membership Of The Permanent Advisory Council For The Rhode Island House Veterans' Affairs Committee
Title
House Resolution Amending The Membership Of The Permanent Advisory Council For The Rhode Island House Veterans' Affairs Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | House read and passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |