RI H5581 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the administration of standardized state-wide assessments or similar tests to students identified as limited English proficient students prior to September 1, 2020.
Title
Education Of Limited English Proficient Students
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5581.pdf |