RI H5543 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Department of health to promulgate rules and regulations for essential caregivers at nursing homes during a declared emergency.
Title
Rights Of Nursing Home Patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2021-06-17 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |