RI H5525 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that effective July 1, 2019, a municipality not in compliance with the state's recycling and diversion rates for solid waste may enter into an agreement with the Resource Recovery Corporation to attain those rates.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Mario Mendez [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5525.pdf |