RI H5519 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions - Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals (would Require The Electronic Submission Of Required Reports Under This Chapter To The Attorney General)
Title
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions - Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals (would Require The Electronic Submission Of Required Reports Under This Chapter To The Attorney General)
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Martin [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | House passed floor amendment only |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2013) |
2013-04-30 | House | House passed floor amendment only |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2013) |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-04-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2013) |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |