RI H5512 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property - Forms And Effect Of Conveyances (would Provide That All Transfers Of A Mortgage Interest On Residential Property Be Recorded So As To Provide A Clean Chain Of Title For Consumers To Track The Owner Of Their Mortgage Loans)
Title
An Act Relating To Property - Forms And Effect Of Conveyances (would Provide That All Transfers Of A Mortgage Interest On Residential Property Be Recorded So As To Provide A Clean Chain Of Title For Consumers To Track The Owner Of Their Mortgage Loans)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2013) |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5512.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5512A.pdf |