RI H5508 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/20/2023)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/20/2023)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of liability of third persons for damages relating to claims for workers compensation, provides that reimbursement not be provided for certain damages, and reduces any award by any percentage of the employees comparative negligence.
Title
Workers' Compensation--procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/20/2023) |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-05 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/06/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5508.pdf |