RI H5504 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes domestic pets as eligible to use medical marijuana if certified by a licensed veterinarian and provides that the cannabis commission adopt rules and regulations concerning the prescribing of medical cannabis for domestic pet use.
Title
Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5504.pdf |