RI H5489 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Meeting postponed (05/14/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Meeting postponed (05/14/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Burglary And Breaking And Entering (would Clarify, Delineate And Increase Penalties For Breaking And Entering And Would Provide For Increased Sanctions When Breaking And Entering Is Committed When There Is Someone Within The Premises)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Burglary And Breaking And Entering (would Clarify, Delineate And Increase Penalties For Breaking And Entering And Would Provide For Increased Sanctions When Breaking And Entering Is Committed When There Is Someone Within The Premises)
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Meeting postponed (05/14/2013) |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5489.pdf |