RI H5477 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-11 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits and/or regulates the possession or sale of shark fins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-09 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2015-06-09HouseHouse passed Sub A
2015-06-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/09/2015)
2015-06-04HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-02HouseScheduled for consideration (06/04/2015)
2015-04-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-03-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2015)
2015-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback