RI H5470 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Classifies all vehicles used by the department of corrections in the performance official duties as authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Definitions And General Code Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |