RI H5462 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors--a Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election) (proposed Constitutional Amendment That Would Require All Winning Candidates For General Office And General Assembly Elections Receive A Majority Of The Votes, With An Instant Runoff Voting System If No Initial Majority Of Votes Is Received.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors--a Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election) (proposed Constitutional Amendment That Would Require All Winning Candidates For General Office And General Assembly Elections Receive A Majority Of The Votes, With An Instant Runoff Voting System If No Initial Majority Of Votes Is Received.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-03-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015)
2015-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback