RI H5461 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes cities and towns, by ordinance, to allow all their residents to vote in municipal elections for municipal officeholders regardless of the immigration status of their residents.
Title
Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] |
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5461.pdf |