RI H5453 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of elementary and secondary education to use separate collection categories and tabulations for specified Asian ethnic groups in every demographic report on ancestry or ethnic origins of residents.
Title
All Students Count Act
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2017-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |