RI H5446 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from state taxation certain pension benefits that originate from another state.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5446.pdf |