RI H5432 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Motor Vehicle Offenses (would Decrease The Maximum Blood Alcohol Concentration For A Person 18 Years To 20 Years When Charged For Driving While Impaired From Less Than One-tenth Of One Percent (.1%) To Less Than Eight One-hundredths Of One Percent (.08%) By Weight)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Motor Vehicle Offenses (would Decrease The Maximum Blood Alcohol Concentration For A Person 18 Years To 20 Years When Charged For Driving While Impaired From Less Than One-tenth Of One Percent (.1%) To Less Than Eight One-hundredths Of One Percent (.08%) By Weight)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013) |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | House | House read and passed |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/20/2013) |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2013) |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5432.pdf |