RI H5425 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-21 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/22/2021)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-21 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/22/2021)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an economic growth blockchain act, set regulations for the sale of hemp, regulate virtual and digital assets and establish depository banks for these purposes.
Title
Rhode Island Economic Growth Blockchain Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-21 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/22/2021) |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5425.pdf |