RI H5413 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employers with eighteen (18) or more employees to provide three (3) paid sick days in 2018, four (4) paid sick days in 2019 and five (5) paid sick days thereafter.
Title
Healthy And Safe Families And Workplaces Act
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-09-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (09/15/2017) |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |