RI H5408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a change in outdoor advertisement copy by means of trivision technology or other equivalent technology without approval by the department of transportation or the federal highway administration.
Title
Outdoor Advertising
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5408.pdf |