RI H5376 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Curriculum--cpr Training (would Provide Minimum Guidelines For Cpr Training And Would Require An Overview Of Automated External Defibrillator (aed) Use)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Curriculum--cpr Training (would Provide Minimum Guidelines For Cpr Training And Would Require An Overview Of Automated External Defibrillator (aed) Use)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Karen Macbeth [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-18 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-13 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2013-05-29 | House | House read and passed |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2013) |
2013-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2013) |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5376.pdf |