RI H5373 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Personal Income Tax (would Allow A Rhode Island Income Tax Deduction For Medical And Dental Expenses Not Covered By Insurance, Provided The Taxpayer Qualifies For The Deduction Under Federal Law (26 Usc 213)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Personal Income Tax (would Allow A Rhode Island Income Tax Deduction For Medical And Dental Expenses Not Covered By Insurance, Provided The Taxpayer Qualifies For The Deduction Under Federal Law (26 Usc 213)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2013) |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5373.pdf |