RI H5367 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the reimbursement to a school district or municipality for the employment of newly hired school resource officers only.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5367.pdf |