RI H5365 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that professional engineers who are registered and authorized to practice by the Rhode Island state board of registration for professional engineers be deemed to have met the qualifications for a designer's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designers Of Individual Sewage Disposal Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-25SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-21SenateScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2019-03-28HouseHouse read and passed
2019-03-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/28/2019)
2019-03-19HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-03-15HouseScheduled for consideration (03/19/2019)
2019-02-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019)
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback