RI H5356 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits PFAS, a class of fluorinated organic chemicals, from being used in food packaging.
Title
Pfas In Food Packaging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2021-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-04 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |