RI H5351 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission" (creates A 15 Member "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission," To Study And Make Recommendations Legislation To Set Property Value For Local Tax Purposes, And Who Would Report Back By 1/2/2020, And Expire On March 2, 2020.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission" (creates A 15 Member "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission," To Study And Make Recommendations Legislation To Set Property Value For Local Tax Purposes, And Who Would Report Back By 1/2/2020, And Expire On March 2, 2020.)
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2019-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |