RI H5342 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Efficiency And Cost Of Snow Removal From State And Local Roads (creates A 5 Member Study Commission To Study The Efficacy And Fiscal Impact And Outlay From Snow Removal On State And Local Roads, And Who Would Report Back By January 6, 2016, And Would Expire On April 6, 2016.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Efficiency And Cost Of Snow Removal From State And Local Roads (creates A 5 Member Study Commission To Study The Efficacy And Fiscal Impact And Outlay From Snow Removal On State And Local Roads, And Who Would Report Back By January 6, 2016, And Would Expire On April 6, 2016.)
Sponsors
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5342.pdf |