RI H5323 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the state board of pharmacy, in collaboration with the Rhode Island department of health, to annually identify up to fifteen (15) prescription drugs on which the state spends significant health care dollars due to increases in costs.
Title
Pharmaceutical Cost Transparency
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5323.pdf |