RI H5296 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that pharmacists shall disclose lesser price drug substitutions unless directed otherwise by the doctor. Exempts pharmacists automatically charging the lowest available price.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5296.pdf |