RI H5292 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Collection Of Taxes Generally (would Authorize The Tax Collector Of Glocester To Furnish A Tax Certificate Upon Application For Any Municipal Lien Certificate For Taxes Assessed Against Mobile Or Manufactured Homes)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Collection Of Taxes Generally (would Authorize The Tax Collector Of Glocester To Furnish A Tax Certificate Upon Application For Any Municipal Lien Certificate For Taxes Assessed Against Mobile Or Manufactured Homes)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2013) |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5292.pdf |