RI H5287 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Woonsocket city council to increase the period of exemption or stabilization of taxes on qualifying property located in designated districts in the city from ten (10) years to twenty (20) years.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-02 | House | House read and passed |
2023-02-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/02/2023) |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/16/2023) |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |