RI H5257 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in housing against those persons who have a lawful source of income.
Title
Rhode Island Fair Housing Practices Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/13/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-02-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/25/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |