RI H5241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes and provide for online sports wagering through authorized hosting facilities in Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video-lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 10 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-19SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/19/2019)
2019-03-12HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-03-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/12/2019)
2019-03-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-03-01HouseProposed Substitute
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-02-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019)
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback