RI H5235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the governor submit a zero based budget to the general assembly. The zero based budget would be phased in over a five (5) year period.
Title
Relating To State Budget
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5235.pdf |