RI H5234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes persons seventy (70) years of age or older eligible for exemption from jury service.
Title
Procedure Generally - Jury Lists
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5234.pdf |