RI H5232 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves municipal employees' unions of their obligation to represent nonmember employees, in the grievance process, if they haven't been union members for 90 days before the grievance event.
Title
Municipal Employees' Arbitration
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5232.pdf |