RI H5226 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Establishment Of Procedures To Regulate And License The Intentional Manipulation Of The Global Environment Through Geoengineering (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study The Regulation And Licensure Of Geoengineering And Expiration Dates From February 7, 2019, To April 30, 2019, And Expires On May 30, 2019.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Establishment Of Procedures To Regulate And License The Intentional Manipulation Of The Global Environment Through Geoengineering (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study The Regulation And Licensure Of Geoengineering And Expiration Dates From February 7, 2019, To April 30, 2019, And Expires On May 30, 2019.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5226.pdf |