RI H5222 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a real estate broker to release customer or client funds in an escrow account as instructed by the parties to a failed real estate transaction, within ten (10) days of receipt of a written release.
Title
Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | House read and passed |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |