RI H5213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires non-emergency child placements by DCYF to include in the petition for placement investigations of both paternal and maternal families.
Title
Abused And Neglected Children
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5213.pdf |