RI H5210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it a motor vehicle offense to stop on a public highway in order to exchange items with a person located outside a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5210.pdf |