RI H5198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the recipients of general or an "Undesirable - Class I or II Homosexual" discharges to qualify for state veterans' benefits when the discharge was based on the veteran's sexual orientation.
Title
Veterans' Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5198.pdf |