RI H5196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Limits health plans that provide coverage for prescription insulin drugs used to treat diabetes to forty dollars ($40.00) for a copayment for a thirty (30) day supply of medically necessary insulin. Effective date 1/1/2022.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2021-06-03 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2021) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |