RI H5187 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the fines for the late filing of campaign finance reports to $100.00 for a second offense,$500.00 for a third offense, and $1,000.00 for all subsequent offenses.
Title
Campaign Finance Reporting
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2021-02-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/10/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5187.pdf |