RI H5185 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Officers And Employees - Merit System (would Provide That Highway Maintenance Operators Shall Be Eligible For Overtime Work Despite Being Granted Sick Leave During The Same Payroll Period)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Officers And Employees - Merit System (would Provide That Highway Maintenance Operators Shall Be Eligible For Overtime Work Despite Being Granted Sick Leave During The Same Payroll Period)
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Spencer Dickinson [D] |
Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5185.pdf |